WI AB529 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-13)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.255 (1) (en) and 115.28 (66) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to the Wisconsin Safe and Healthy Schools Center and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to the Wisconsin Safe and Healthy Schools Center and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Education and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 92, Noes 3 |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-11-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa |
2019-10-24 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-23 | House | Representative Born added as a coauthor |
2019-10-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |