WI AB527 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.33 (4) (b), 23.33 (5) (a) 5., 23.33 (11) (am) 1., 23.33 (11) (b), 23.50 (1), 23.50 (3), 23.53 (1), 23.56 (1), 23.57 (1) (intro.), 23.58, 23.62 (1) (intro.) and 800.02 (2) (b); and to create 23.33 (1) (fg), 23.33 (1) (ii), 23.33 (4) (g) and 23.33 (11g) of the statutes; Relating to: the operation of all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles on highways for the purpose of certain types of access and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
The operation of all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles on highways for the purpose of certain types of access and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-12-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-11-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab527 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB527.pdf |