WI AB525 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (5) (dm) and 51.03 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: implementing a suicide prevention program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Implementing a suicide prevention program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 93, Noes 2 |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-11 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-10-11 | House | Introduced |