WI AB516 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.33 (11) (am) 1.; and to create 349.11 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing posting of speed limits applicable to all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles.
Title
Authorizing posting of speed limits applicable to all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:18 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2021-10-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-08 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-08-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-08-31 | House | Introduced |