WI AB506 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 94.55 (2t), 961.11 (4g), 961.14 (4) (t), 961.32 (2m), 961.38 (1n), 961.41 (1) (h), 961.41 (1m) (h), 961.41 (1q), 961.41 (3g) (e), 961.571 (1) (a) 7., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. e., 961.571 (1) (a) 11. k. and L. and 967.055 (1m) (b) 5.; to renumber and amend 115.35 (1), 961.01 (14) and 961.34; to amend 20.115 (7) (gc), 49.148 (4) (a), 49.79 (1) (b), 59.54 (25) (title), 59.54 (25) (a) (intro.), 66.0107 (1) (bm), 111.35 (2) (e), 114.09 (2) (bm) 1. (intro.), 114.09 (2) (bm) 4., 157.06 (11) (i), 175.35 (2g) (c) 4. a., 289.33 (3) (d), 349.02 (2) (b) 4., 961.41 (1r), 961.41 (1x), 961.41 (3g) (c), 961.41 (3g) (d), 961.41 (3g) (em), 961.47 (1), 961.48 (3), 961.48 (5), 961.49 (1m) (intro.), 961.571 (1) (a) 11. (intro.), 971.365 (1) (a), 971.365 (1) (b), 971.365 (1) (c) and 971.365 (2); and to create 16.282, 20.115 (7) (ge), 20.192 (1) (t), 20.255 (2) (r), 20.395 (5) (db), 20.435 (1) (s), 20.437 (3) (r), 20.505 (1) (t), 20.566 (1) (bn), 20.835 (2) (eq), 25.316, 48.47 (20), 66.04185, 73.17, 77.54 (71), 94.56, 94.57, 100.145, 108.02 (18r), 108.04 (5m), 111.32 (9m), 111.32 (11m), subchapter IV of chapter 139 [precedes 139.97], 157.06 (11) (hm), 175.35 (2g) (b) 3., 238.139, 250.22 and subchapter VIII of chapter 961 [precedes 961.70] of the statutes; Relating to: legalizing the possession of marijuana; medical marijuana; regulating the production, processing, and sale of marijuana; expunging or redesignating past convictions for marijuana-related crimes; equity grants; making an appropriation; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Legalizing the possession of marijuana; medical marijuana; regulating the production, processing, and sale of marijuana; expunging or redesignating past convictions for marijuana-related crimes; equity grants; making an appropriation; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-27 | House | LRB correction |
2023-10-26 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2023-10-23 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2023-10-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2023-10-18 | House | Introduced |