WI AB478 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 757.02 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting a judge from holding a nonjudicial office of public trust while serving in the office to which the judge was appointed or elected.
Title
Prohibiting a judge from holding a nonjudicial office of public trust while serving in the office to which the judge was appointed or elected.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:10 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2019-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-09-26 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab478 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB478.pdf |