WI AB462 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.45 (9r) and 49.46 (2) (b) 6. dm. of the statutes; Relating to: complex rehabilitation technology for complex needs patients in the Medical Assistance program and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Complex rehabilitation technology for complex needs patients in the Medical Assistance program and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2018-03-22 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kolste |
2018-01-29 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Jagler |
2017-10-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jagler |
2017-09-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-09-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jagler |
2017-08-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-08-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2017-08-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab462 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB462.pdf |