WI AB462 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.45 (23) (a), 49.471 (4) (a) 4. b. and 118.60 (2) (a) (intro.); and to create 49.471 (1) (cr), 49.471 (4g) and 118.60 (12) of the statutes; Relating to: Medicaid expansion, eligibility for BadgerCare Plus and BadgerCare Plus Core, and ending the statewide parental choice program. (FE)
Title
Medicaid expansion, eligibility for BadgerCare Plus and BadgerCare Plus Core, and ending the statewide parental choice program. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Rep. Peter Barca [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-12 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up, Ayes 35, Noes 61 |
2015-11-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-10-27 | House | Introduced |