WI AB456 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-3-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-3-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.03 (11m) (a) 2., 440.03 (13) (b) 72., 440.08 (2) (a) 69., 452.01 (4d), 452.01 (4h), 452.01 (4p), 452.01 (4t), 452.01 (9), 452.025, 452.025 (4), 452.09 (1) (c), 452.09 (5), 452.10 (4) (a), 452.12 (6), 452.137 (1) (b), 452.137 (1) (d) and 452.17 (2); to renumber and amend 452.03, 452.10 (4) (b) and 452.19; to consolidate, renumber and amend 440.03 (11m) (a) (intro.) and 1.; to amend 73.0301 (1) (a), 108.227 (1) (b), 186.113 (19), 440.03 (11m) (am), 440.03 (11m) (b), 440.03 (11m) (c), 440.13 (2) (c), 452.01 (1m), 452.01 (3) (d), 452.01 (3e), 452.01 (3m), 452.01 (3s), 452.01 (3w), 452.01 (4), 452.01 (5), 452.01 (5), 452.01 (5j), 452.01 (5m) (b), 452.01 (5p), 452.01 (5p), 452.01 (5w), 452.01 (7), 452.01 (7r), 452.01 (9), 452.025 (1) (b) 3., 452.025 (3) (a), 452.025 (3) (b) 2. g., 452.05 (1) (a), 452.05 (1) (a), 452.05 (1) (i) (intro.), 452.05 (1) (i) 1., 452.05 (1) (i) 3. b., 452.07 (1m), 452.07 (2), 452.07 (2), 452.09 (1) (b), 452.09 (2) (c) (intro.), 452.09 (3) (a), 452.09 (4) (a) 1., 452.10 (1), 452.10 (2) (a), 452.11 (1), 452.12 (2) (a), 452.12 (2) (c), 452.12 (3), 452.12 (4), 452.12 (5) (b), 452.12 (5) (c), 452.13 (1) (a), 452.13 (2) (a), 452.13 (2) (b), 452.13 (2) (bm), 452.13 (2) (c), 452.13 (2) (e) (intro.), 452.13 (2) (e) 2., 452.13 (2) (f) 1., 452.13 (3), 452.13 (4), 452.13 (5), 452.132 (2) (c), 452.133 (title), 452.133 (1) (intro.), (c), (d), (e), (f) and (g), 452.133 (2) (intro.), (a) 1. and 2., (b) and (c), 452.133 (3), 452.133 (4) (a) and (b) 1. and 2., 452.133 (5), 452.133 (6) (intro.) and (a), 452.134 (1) (a), 452.134 (1) (b), 452.134 (2), 452.134 (3), 452.134 (4), 452.135 (1) and (2), 452.137 (2) (a) 1., 452.137 (2) (a) 2., 452.137 (2) (b) 1., 452.137 (2) (b) 2., 452.137 (2) (c), 452.137 (2) (d), 452.137 (2) (e), 452.137 (2) (f), 452.137 (2) (g), 452.137 (3) (intro.), 452.137 (3) (c), 452.137 (3) (c), 452.137 (4) (a), 452.137 (4) (b) (intro.), 452.137 (4) (b) 1., 452.137 (4) (b) 3., 452.138, 452.139 (1), (2) and (3), 452.14 (1), 452.14 (2), 452.14 (3) (intro.), 452.14 (3) (a), 452.14 (3) (b), 452.14 (3) (c), 452.14 (3) (d), 452.14 (3) (f), 452.14 (3) (g), 452.14 (3) (h), 452.14 (3) (i), 452.14 (3) (j), 452.14 (3) (jm), 452.14 (3) (k), 452.14 (3) (L), 452.14 (3) (m), 452.14 (3) (p), 452.14 (4), 452.14 (4m) (intro.), 452.14 (4m) (a), 452.14 (4m) (b), 452.14 (4r), 452.15 (1) and (2), 452.17 (4) (a), 452.17 (4) (a) 1. and 2., 452.19 (1), 452.20, 452.21, 452.22 (2), 452.23 (1), 452.23 (2) (intro.), 452.23 (2) (b), 452.23 (3), 452.23 (4), 452.24 (2), 452.25 (1) (a), 452.25 (1) (b), 452.25 (1) (c) 2., 452.25 (1) (d), 452.25 (1) (e), 452.25 (2) (b), 452.30 (7) (b), 707.55 (5) and 707.55 (7); to repeal and recreate 452.01 (7), 452.14 (3) (intro.) and 452.19 (title); and to create 452.01 (1o), 452.01 (1p), 452.01 (3) (i), 452.01 (4w), 452.01 (4x), 452.01 (4y), 452.01 (5c), 452.03 (2), 452.05 (1) (j), 452.12 (5) (bm), 452.132, 452.133 (4m), 452.142, 452.19 (2), 452.30, 452.34, 452.38, 452.40 and 452.42 of the statutes; Relating to: various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, employment relationships between real estate licensees and real estate brokerage firms, a statute of limitations for actions against persons engaged in real estate practice, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice, employment relationships between real estate licensees and real estate brokerage firms, a statute of limitations for actions against persons engaged in real estate practice, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Published 3-3-2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-2-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 258 |
2016-03-01 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-1-2016 |
2016-02-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-29-2016 |
2016-02-29 | House | LRB correction |
2016-02-29 | House | LRB correction |
2016-02-17 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Wachs |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Allen |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2016-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Young |
2016-02-04 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Allen |
2016-01-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Young |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-12-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-12-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-12-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen |
2015-12-03 | House | LRB correction |
2015-11-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2015-10-27 | House | Introduced |