WI AB363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 632.746 (1) (b), 632.746 (2) (c), (d) and (e), 632.746 (3) (a), 632.746 (3) (d) 2. and 3., 632.746 (5) and 632.76 (2) (ac) 3.; to renumber 632.746 (3) (d) 1.; to renumber and amend 632.746 (1) (a); to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g), 185.983 (1) (intro.), 625.12 (1) (a), 625.12 (1) (e), 625.12 (2), 625.15 (1), 628.34 (3) (a), 632.746 (2) (a), 632.746 (8) (a) (intro.), 632.76 (2) (a) and (ac) 1. and 2., 632.795 (4) (a) and 632.897 (11) (a); and to create 609.847 and 632.728 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting preexisting condition exclusion and setting rates or cost sharing based on preexisting conditions. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting preexisting condition exclusion and setting rates or cost sharing based on preexisting conditions. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Insurance and take up (Y: 34 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Insurance and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59 |
2017-07-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-06-02 | House | Introduced |