WI AB353 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 346.65 (3p) and 346.65 (3r); to amend 346.65 (2) (bm), 346.65 (2) (cm), 346.65 (2) (dm), 346.65 (2j) (bm), 346.65 (2j) (cm), 346.65 (2j) (cr) and 973.11 (1) (intro.); to repeal and recreate 346.65 (3m); and to create 346.65 (3n) and 940.25 (1g) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring a mandatory minimum sentence for causing bodily harm to another while driving while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Requiring a mandatory minimum sentence for causing bodily harm to another while driving while intoxicated and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-11-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2015-11-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2015-10-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-29 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and referred to committee on Judiciary pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2015-09-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-09-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab353 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB353.pdf |