WI AB318 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 447.02 (4), 447.02 (5), 447.06 (1g), 447.06 (1r) and 447.063 of the statutes; Relating to: preserving and transferring dental patient health care records, contracts for practicing dentistry or dental hygiene, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Preserving and transferring dental patient health care records, contracts for practicing dentistry or dental hygiene, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-11-09 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-13 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2017-10-02 | House | Representatives Barca and Ohnstad added as coauthors |
2017-09-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-09-27 | House | Representative Stuck added as a coauthor |
2017-07-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-17 | House | Representative Kremer added as a coauthor |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2017-05-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab318 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB318.pdf |