WI AB301 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1105 (7) (am) 2.; and to create 66.1105 (6) (a) 16., 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. k. and 66.1105 (7) (am) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made and extending the maximum life for Tax Incremental District Number Two in the village of Kronenwetter. (FE)
Title
Lengthening the time during which tax increments may be allocated and expenditures for project costs may be made and extending the maximum life for Tax Incremental District Number Two in the village of Kronenwetter. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab301 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB301.pdf |