WI AB292 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 251.03 (1); and to create 251.01 (1c) of the statutes; Relating to: composition of local boards of health.
Title
Composition of local boards of health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-12 | House | Representative Cabral-Guevara added as a coauthor |
2021-07-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-04 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-05-03 | House | Introduced |