WI AB292 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-15 - Published 12-28-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-15 - Published 12-28-2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 59.43 (2m) (a) 6.; to amend 226.14 (1) (b) and 706.055; and to create 59.43 (1g), 59.43 (2m) (b) 7. and 706.25 (3) (d) of the statutes; relating to: recording and filing documents with the register of deeds.
Title
Recording and filing documents with the register of deeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-15 | Published 12-28-2009. | |
2009-12-11 | Report approved by the Governor on 12-10-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 98 | |
2009-12-08 | Presented to the Governor on 12-8-2009 | |
2009-11-10 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2009-11-05 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-05 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | |
2009-11-04 | Placed on calendar 11-5-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-21 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-21 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-21 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-30 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2009-09-17 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-16 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-09-16 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-16 | Representative Spanbauer added as a coauthor | |
2009-09-10 | Placed on calendar 9-16-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-09-10 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-10 | Report passage recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-09 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-08 | Executive action taken | |
2009-08-25 | Public hearing held | |
2009-06-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-06-02 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2009-06-02 | Introduced |