WI AB274 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 165.76 (1) (f), 304.137 (2) (title) and 304.137 (2); and to create 165.76 (1) (fm) and 304.137 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: submission of human biological specimens to the state crime laboratories.
Title
Submission of human biological specimens to the state crime laboratories.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-05-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-05-25 | House | Representatives Drake and Stubbs added as coauthors |
2021-05-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-04-16 | House | Introduced |