WI AB244 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 49-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 49-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 86.31 (1) (a); to amend 86.31 (2) (a); and to create 20.395 (2) (fc), 59.58 (6), 86.31 (1) (ac) and 86.31 (3o) of the statutes; Relating to: an agricultural roads improvement grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
An agricultural roads improvement grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-06-09 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2023-06-07 | House | Representatives Wichgers and Nedweski added as coauthors |
2023-06-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2023-05-23 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2023-05-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-22 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-05-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2023-05-03 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-04-28 | House | Introduced |