WI AB242 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 84.30 (5) (bm); and to create 84.30 (5) (e) of the statutes; relating to: the removal of nonconforming outdoor advertising signs.
Title
The removal of nonconforming outdoor advertising signs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2010-04-21 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 83, Noes 15 | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-15 | Made a special order of business at 11:03 A.M. on 4-20-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | |
2010-04-15 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-15 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 2 | |
2009-12-03 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-10 | Public hearing held | |
2009-05-21 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab242 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB242.pdf |