WI AB236 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: waiting lists for housing choice vouchers. (FE)
Title
Waiting lists for housing choice vouchers. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | House | Published 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-27-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 75 |
2017-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-22-2017 |
2017-11-06 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-6-2017 |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Report rejection of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-10-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Workforce Development, Military Affairs and Senior Issues |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 73, Noes 25 |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2017-05-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Subeck |
2017-05-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-25 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefit Reform, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2017-04-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-20 | House | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Subeck |
2017-04-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit Reform |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced |