WI AB234 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-22-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: tourism industry grants. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism industry grants. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseReport vetoed by the Governor on 4-22-2021
2021-04-21HousePresented to the Governor on 4-21-2021 by directive of the Speaker
2021-04-14HouseReport correctly enrolled on 4-14-2021
2021-04-14HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2021-04-14SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-04-14SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 13
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended
2021-04-14SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-04-14SenateRead a second time
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-04-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-04-14SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-04-13HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-04-13HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 56, Noes 37
2021-04-13HouseRules suspended
2021-04-13HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-04-13HouseDecision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 56, Noes 36
2021-04-13HouseDecision of the Chair appealed
2021-04-13HousePoint of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
2021-04-13HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Anderson, Baldeh, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Conley, Considine, Doyle, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Hong, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, Moore Omokunde, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Ortiz-Velez, Pope, Riemer, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Vruwink
2021-04-13HouseRead a second time
2021-04-12HouseRepresentative Kitchens added as a coauthor
2021-04-09HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a coauthor
2021-04-08HousePlaced on calendar 4-13-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-04-08HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-04-08HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2021-04-07HouseExecutive action taken
2021-04-06HousePublic hearing held
2021-04-06HouseRepresentatives Born, Armstrong, Mursau, Petryk, Knodl, Loudenbeck and James added as coauthors
2021-04-02HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy
2021-04-02HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback