WI AB231 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.497 (2) (h); to renumber 15.497 (2) (b) to (g); to renumber and amend 15.497 (2) (a); to amend 15.497 (2) (intro.); and to create 15.497 (2) (ag) (intro.), 15.497 (2) (am) and 15.497 (2) (ar) of the statutes; Relating to: members of the Council on Veterans Programs.
Title
Members of the Council on Veterans Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-17 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2023-10-16 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-10-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-10-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-08-25 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Riemer |
2023-06-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2023-05-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-26 | House | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |