WI AB225 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 76.638 (2); and to create 76.638 (2) (b) and 76.638 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: allocation of early stage seed investment credit to offset taxes imposed on insurers. (FE)
Title
Allocation of early stage seed investment credit to offset taxes imposed on insurers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-12 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2019-05-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab225 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB225.pdf |