WI AB213 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 256.01 (9), 256.15 (4) (a) 2. and 256.15 (4) (c); and to create 256.15 (4) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: ambulance staffing by emergency medical technicians and first responders. (FE)
Title
Ambulance staffing by emergency medical technicians and first responders. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Dave Considine [D] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] |
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2015-09-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2015-09-18 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2015-09-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau |
2015-09-01 | House | Representative Kremer added as a coauthor |
2015-08-19 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2015-08-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-06-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Mursau |
2015-06-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau |
2015-05-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-13 | House | Representative Milroy added as a coauthor |
2015-05-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab213 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB213.pdf |