WI AB199 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 101.12 (2); and to create 101.12 (2) (b) and 101.12 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: permission to start construction of a commercial building before plan approval. (FE)
Title
Permission to start construction of a commercial building before plan approval. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-30 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-09-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-01 | House | Housing report received pursuant to s. 13.099 (2) Wisconsin Statutes |
2023-05-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |