WI AB197 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.84 (2g) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: pre-adoption training formats. (FE)
Title
Pre-adoption training formats. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-19 | House | Representative Conley added as a coauthor |
2021-04-13 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-04-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced |