WI AB169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 446.028 of the statutes; Relating to: continuing education program sponsors for chiropractors, chiropractic technicians, and chiropractic radiological technicians. (FE)
Title
Continuing education program sponsors for chiropractors, chiropractic technicians, and chiropractic radiological technicians. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | Representative Petryk added as a coauthor |
2019-09-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-27 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2019-09-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab169 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB169.pdf |