WI AB122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 27.01 (7) (c) 10., 36.49 (4), 115.28 (7) (e) 1., 115.28 (54m), 115.30 (3), 115.385 (4), 115.45 (2) (a), 118.133 (1), 118.133 (2), 118.15 (1) (a), 118.153 (1) (b), 118.53 (title), 118.53 (2m), (3) and (4), 118.60 (7) (b) 3., 119.23 (7) (b) 3. and 120.18 (1) (a) 2.; and to create 115.001 (3p), 118.15 (4c) and 118.162 (1) (km) of the statutes; Relating to: microschools. (FE)
Title
Microschools. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2022-04-08 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-8-2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-10-2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2022-02-22 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 60, Noes 34 |
2022-02-22 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2022-02-22 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2022-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Neubauer, Pope, Hebl, Considine, Vruwink, Anderson, Andraca, Baldeh, Billings, Brostoff, Conley, Drake, Emerson, Goyke, Hesselbein, Hong, B. Meyers, Ohnstad, Riemer, S. Rodriguez, Shankland, Shelton, Sinicki, Snodgrass, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Subeck, Vining and Haywood |
2022-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-11-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 6 |
2021-11-15 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 6 |
2021-04-28 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-04-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2021-04-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2021-03-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced |