WI AB1176 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 196.504 (2) (a); and to create 20.155 (3) (g), 196.504 (1) (aa), 196.504 (2g) and 196.504 (2r) of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for broadband expansion grants, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Requirements for broadband expansion grants, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-04-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-04-03 | House | Representative Madison added as a coauthor |
2024-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2024-03-22 | House | Introduced |