WI AB1125 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 134.65 (8) and 139.75 (14); to renumber and amend 134.65 (1); to amend 134.65 (title), 134.65 (1m), 134.65 (1r), 134.65 (4), 134.65 (5m), 134.65 (6), 134.66 (1) (g), 139.75 (1), 139.75 (2), 139.75 (4) (a), 139.75 (4) (b), 139.75 (4) (c), 139.75 (5), 139.75 (6), 139.75 (7), 139.75 (8), 139.75 (9), 139.75 (10), 139.75 (11), 139.75 (13), 139.76, 139.77 (1), 139.78 (1), 139.78 (1m), 139.78 (2), 139.79 (1), 139.80, 139.801 (1), 139.801 (3) (a), 139.801 (3) (b), 139.801 (3) (c), 139.801 (4), 139.802, 139.803 (4), 139.803 (5), 139.805, 139.81 (1), 139.82 (1), 139.82 (2) and 139.82 (8); and to create 20.566 (1) (am), 134.65 (1a), 134.65 (2m), 134.65 (9) and 139.75 (4b) of the statutes; Relating to: licenses for the retail sale of electronic smoking devices and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Licenses for the retail sale of electronic smoking devices and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduced |