WI AB1070 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 16.84 (5) (d), 165.055 (3), 227.20 (3) (c), 227.46 (3) (a), 227.46 (8), 230.08 (2) (sb) and 238.399 (3) (e); to renumber 227.138 (1) (a) to (h); to renumber and amend 13.90 (3), 15.165 (2), 165.08, 165.25 (6) (a), 227.135 (2), 227.135 (4), 227.137 (3) (e), 227.138 (1) (intro.), 227.40 (3) (intro.), 227.40 (3) (a) and 343.50 (1) (c); to amend 5.02 (6m) (f), 13.56 (2), 13.90 (2), 13.91 (1) (c), 20.455 (1) (gh), 20.455 (2) (gb), 20.455 (3) (g), 45.57, 165.10, 165.25 (1), 165.25 (1m), 227.01 (13) (intro.), subchapter II (title) of chapter 227 [precedes 227.10], 227.11 (title), 227.13, 227.135 (3), 227.137 (2), 227.137 (4), 227.138 (2), 227.185, 227.20 (3) (a), 227.24 (1) (e) 1d., 227.24 (1) (e) 1g., 227.40 (1), 227.40 (2) (intro.), 227.40 (2) (e), 227.40 (3) (b) and (c), 227.40 (4) (a), 227.40 (6), 227.46 (1) (h), 227.46 (2), 227.46 (2m), 227.47 (1), 227.57 (11), 238.02 (1), 238.02 (2), 238.02 (3), 238.399 (3) (a), 281.665 (5) (d), 343.50 (3) (b), 801.50 (3) (b), 806.04 (11), 809.13 and subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 893 [precedes 893.80]; and to create 13.103, 13.124, 13.127, 13.365, 13.48 (24m), 13.90 (3) (a) and (b), 15.07 (1) (b) 24., 15.165 (2) (d) and (f) to (i), 16.42 (5), 16.84 (2m), 16.973 (15), 35.93 (2) (b) 3. im., 165.07, 227.01 (3m), 227.05, 227.10 (2g), 227.11 (3), 227.112, 227.135 (1) (g), 227.135 (1) (h), 227.135 (2) (a) 2., 227.135 (4) (a) 1. to 6., 227.135 (6), 227.137 (2m), 227.137 (3) (e) 1. to 4., 227.137 (3m), 227.138 (1g), 227.18 (3m), 227.26 (2) (im), 227.47 (3), 238.04 (15), 238.399 (3) (am), 301.03 (16), 343.165 (8), 343.50 (1) (c) 2., 343.50 (3) (c), 803.09 (2m) and 893.825 of the statutes; Relating to: legislative powers and duties, state agency and authority composition and operations, and administrative rule-making process. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative powers and duties, state agency and authority composition and operations, and administrative rule-making process. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2018-12-06HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-12-04HouseRead a second time
2018-12-04HouseReferred to calendar of 12-4-2018 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93
2018-12-04HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2018-12-04HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4
2018-12-03HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
2018-12-03HouseExecutive action taken
2018-12-03HousePublic hearing held
2018-11-30HouseRead first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance
2018-11-30HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback