WI AB1026 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.33 (6) (a) 4., 118.33 (6) (b) 2r., 118.33 (6) (c) 4. and 118.33 (6) (cr) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting grade promotion on the basis of absences from school. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting grade promotion on the basis of absences from school. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2024-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2024-02-20 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2024-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Shelton and Hong |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced |