WI AB1019 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (17) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: limitations on the total value of taxable property that may be included in a tax incremental financing district created in the city of Wausau. (FE)
Title
Limitations on the total value of taxable property that may be included in a tax incremental financing district created in the city of Wausau. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:22 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced |