WA SJR8208 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a conflicting residency requirement for voting in a presidential election.
Title
Repealing a conflicting residency requirement for voting in a presidential election.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] |
Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-13 | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8208&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Joint Resolutions/8208.pdf |