WA SJM8019 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that a portion of state route number 509 be named the Philip Martin Lelli Memorial Highway.
Title
Requesting that a portion of state route number 509 be named the Philip Martin Lelli Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |