WA SJM8009 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Summary
Requesting Congress to provide the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Fisheries with sufficient resources to expedite its endangered species act and national environmental policy act review of Puget Sound hatchery and genetic management plans and that the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Fisheries prioritize and conduct immediate review and approval of Puget Sound hatchery and genetic management plans.
Title
Requesting Congress to provide the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Fisheries with sufficient resources to expedite its endangered species act and national environmental policy act review of Puget Sound hatchery and genetic management plans and that the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Fisheries prioritize and conduct immediate review and approval of Puget Sound hatchery and genetic management plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-29 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=8009&year=2017 |
Roll Call | http://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=8009&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2017 |