WA SJM8006 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress, the President, and the Departments of Education, Health and Human Services, and Justice to take action to implement the recommendations of the Government Accountability Office concerning efforts to prevent and respond to child sexual abuse by school personnel and sexual abuse between peers.
Title
Requesting Congress, the President, and the Departments of Education, Health and Human Services, and Justice to take action to implement the recommendations of the Government Accountability Office concerning efforts to prevent and respond to child sexual abuse by school personnel and sexual abuse between peers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-20 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |