WA SCR8400 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing cutoff dates for the consideration of legislation during the 2017 regular session of the sixty-fifth legislature.
Title
Establishing cutoff dates for the consideration of legislation during the 2017 regular session of the sixty-fifth legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-01-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-01-12 | House | Third reading, adopted. |
2017-01-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-01-10 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2017-01-10 | House | First Reading. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |