WA SB6643 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Combining a resolution proposing abandonment and a resolution proposing a council-manager plan of government into a single proposition.
Title
Combining a resolution proposing abandonment and a resolution proposing a council-manager plan of government into a single proposition.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |