WA SB6638 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing reentry services.
Title
Providing reentry services.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |