WA SB6609 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning infrastructure financing for local governments.
Title
Concerning infrastructure financing for local governments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Randolph I. Gordon [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. James Kastama [D] |
Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-22 | Chapter 164, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-22 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-11 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-09 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2010-03-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-08 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-05 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-03-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-03-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-28 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-28 | EDTI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2985 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.