WA SB6584 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Applying the prohibition against unfair practices by insurers and their remedies and penalties to the state health care authority.
Title
Applying the prohibition against unfair practices by insurers and their remedies and penalties to the state health care authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 293, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2895 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.