WA SB6572 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expenditure limit for the state universal communications services program.
Title
Concerning the expenditure limit for the state universal communications services program.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |