WA SB6568 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating accounts for the center for childhood deafness and hearing loss and for the school for the blind.
Title
Creating accounts for the center for childhood deafness and hearing loss and for the school for the blind.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-07 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-07 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-07 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-06 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2757 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Effective date 6/7/2012.