WA SB6568 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing minimum notification requirements for property and casualty insurance policy changes.
Title
Establishing minimum notification requirements for property and casualty insurance policy changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-03 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-02 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6568&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6568.pdf |