WA SB6559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum Washington college grant award at independent institutions of higher education.
Title
Increasing the maximum Washington college grant award at independent institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2917 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - First reading, referred to Appropriations.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6559&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6559.pdf |