WA SB6540 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the combined fund drive from the department of personnel to the secretary of state.
Title
Transferring the combined fund drive from the department of personnel to the secretary of state.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 101, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | President signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-23 | APPG - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2010-02-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2902 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.