WA SB6534 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a maternal mortality review panel.
Title
Establishing a maternal mortality review panel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 238, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-26 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; without recommendation. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2885 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.