WA SB6522 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the accountable care organization pilot projects.
Title
Establishing the accountable care organization pilot projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Sen. Edward Murray [D] | Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-25 | Chapter 220, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-25 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-03 | President signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-25 | APPH - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations. | |
2010-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-16 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-16 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-02-03 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |