WA SB6480 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Developing comprehensive school counseling programs.
Title
Developing comprehensive school counseling programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2699 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-20 - First reading, referred to Education.