WA SB6480 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a business and occupation tax credit for capital costs associated with providing retail broadband service using qualified broadband equipment.
Title
Creating a business and occupation tax credit for capital costs associated with providing retail broadband service using qualified broadband equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | EET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |